OR SB462 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates credit against personal income taxes for amounts paid as interest on qualified education loans. Creates credit against personal income taxes for amounts paid as interest on qualified education loans. Applies to tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2021, and before January 1, 2027. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to tax credits for interest paid on qualified education loans; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Fred Girod [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Withdraw from Committee (Y: 7 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Motion to withdraw from committee on Education failed. Ayes, 7; Nays, 18--Beyer, Burdick, Dembrow, Frederick, Gelser, Golden, Gorsek, Heard, Jama, Johnson, Lieber, Manning Jr, Patterson, Prozanski, Riley, Steiner Hayward, Taylor, Wagner; Excused, 5--Anderson, Findley, Hansell, President Courtney, Thatcher. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Education, then Tax Expenditures. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |