OR SB454 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Enrolled on June 30 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-07-10 - Speaker signed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Transfers administration of Uniform Disposition of Unclaimed Property Act, unclaimed estates and escheating funds from Department of State Lands to State Treasurer. Eliminates additional requirements for recovering proceeds of unclaimed United States savings bonds. Becomes operative July 1, 2021. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to administering unclaimed properties; and prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2019-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-29 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to resolve conflicts. (Printed C-Eng.) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-10HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-07-03SenatePresident signed.
2019-06-30SenateSenate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 26; Absent, 2--Girod, Linthicum; Excused, 2--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist.
2019-06-30HouseRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Marsh. Passed. Ayes, 52; Nays, 2--Evans, Hayden; Excused, 4--Clem, Noble, Sprenger, Wallan; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek.
2019-06-30HouseSecond reading.
2019-06-30HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed C-Engrossed.
2019-06-29HouseWork Session held.
2019-06-29HouseReferred to Ways and Means.
2019-06-29HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2019-06-29SenateThird reading. Carried by Hansell. Passed. Ayes, 27; Absent, 2--Girod, Linthicum; Excused, 1--Boquist.
2019-06-19SenateSecond reading.
2019-06-18SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
2019-06-14SenateWork Session held.
2019-06-12SenateReturned to Full Committee.
2019-06-12SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2019-06-07SenateAssigned to Subcommittee On General Government.
2019-02-27SenateReferred to Ways and Means by order of the President.
2019-02-27SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.)
2019-02-21SenateWork Session held.
2019-02-19SenatePublic Hearing held.
2019-01-16SenateReferred to Business and General Government.
2019-01-14SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/SB454
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB454/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB454/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB454/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB454/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB454/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB454/House%20Amendments%20to%20B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB454/C-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB454/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/27976
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/29982
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=477560
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/30234
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=478249
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=478271

Bill Comments

feedback