OR SB42 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminates sunset for funding dedicated to State Department of Fish and Wildlife fish restoration and enhancement program. Eliminates sunset on dedicating portion of certain angling license fee moneys for expenditure under program. Eliminates sunset on fee surcharges for certain trolling and gillnet permits imposed for expenditure under program. Eliminates sunset on additional fee for landing of certain fish species imposed for expenditure under program. Changes criteria for appointment of Restoration and Enhancement Board members. Changes meeting requirement for board. Eliminates sunset on Columbia River Fisheries Enhancement Fund. Extends State Fish and Wildlife Commission authority to charge for endorsements to certain Columbia River Basin fishing licenses and deposit endorsement moneys to fund. Extends youth license and pioneer license exemptions from endorsement charges.] Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to fish resource programs; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-06-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the B-Eng bill (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. Refer to Ways and Means. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the B-Eng bill (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. Refer to Ways and Means. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-02 | Senate | Effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die. |
2019-07-02 | Senate | Chapter 458, 2019 Laws. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-06-14 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-14 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-06-10 | House | Third reading. Carried by Hayden. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Marsh. |
2019-06-06 | House | Second reading. |
2019-06-05 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-06-04 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-06-04 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Girod. Passed. Ayes, 25; Nays, 3--Boquist, Linthicum, Thatcher; Excused, 1--Taylor. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Carried over to 06-03 by unanimous consent. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Natural Resources. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Motion to rerefer to Environment and Natural Resources carried by voice vote. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Subsequent referral rescinded by order of the President. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources, then Ways and Means. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |