OR SB419 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Applies retroactive to January 1, 2009, Oregon Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association's $300,000 liability limit for long term care insurance. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to the applicability of the Oregon Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association liability limit for long term care policies; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Lew Frederick [D] | Rep. Ken Helm [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-06-04 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-05-23 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2019-05-16 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Frederick. Passed. Ayes, 18; Nays, 10--Baertschiger Jr, Bentz, Girod, Hansell, Heard, Johnson, Knopp, Linthicum, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 2--Olsen, Winters. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Business and General Government. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |