OR SB408 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Effective date, January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Effective date, January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allows county to approve certain divisions of land zoned for exclusive farm use for purposes of siting utility facilities necessary for public service.
Title
Relating to how a county may approve a proposed division of land zoned for exclusive farm use for siting utilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 22 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-17 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2020. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Chapter 262, 2019 Laws. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-05-30 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 22; Nays, 6--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Girod, Heard, Linthicum, Thatcher; Excused, 2--Olsen, Winters. |
2019-05-22 | House | Third reading. Carried by Smith G. Passed. Ayes, 55; Excused, 5--Gorsek, Helm, Smith DB, Sprenger, Wilde. |
2019-05-21 | House | Carried over to May 22, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-20 | House | Carried over to May 21, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-17 | House | Carried over to May 20, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-16 | House | Carried over to May 17, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-15 | House | Carried over to May 16, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-14 | House | Carried over to May 15, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-13 | House | Carried over to May 14, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-09 | House | Carried over to May 13, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-08 | House | Second reading. |
2019-05-07 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2019-05-02 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-04-16 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-25 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Land Use. |
2019-03-18 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Hansell. Passed. Ayes, 30. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Carried over to 03-14 by unanimous consent. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |