OR SB401 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Converts mandatory minimum sentences for specified felonies other than murder to presumptive sentences. Converts mandatory minimum sentences for specified felonies other than murder to presumptive sentences. Authorizes court to impose greater or lesser sentence according to sentencing guidelines of Oregon Criminal Justice Commission. Authorizes person receiving presumptive sentence to be eligible for certain programs and sentence reductions.
Title
Relating to sentencing; providing for criminal sentence reduction that requires approval by a two-thirds majority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Without recommendation as to passage and request referral to Rules (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Referred to Rules by order of the President. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Recommendation: Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Work Session not held. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |