OR SB4 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Effective date, July 1, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Effective date, July 1, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Phases in implementation of number of required minutes of physical education. Allows school districts and public charter schools to meet time requirements for physical education with certain activities that meet academic content standards for physical education. Directs State Board of Education to adopt rules that prorate number of minutes required for instruction in physical education under certain circumstances. Directs Department of Education to provide technical assistance to school districts and public charter schools to enable compliance with physical education requirements. Directs Department of Education to develop recommendations for implementing time requirements for grades six to eight. Requires department to submit recommendations for legislation no later than November 15, 2018. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2017.
Title
Relating to physical education; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-22 | Senate | Effective date, July 1, 2017. |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Chapter 301, 2017 Laws. |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2017-06-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-06-05 | House | Third reading. Carried by Sollman. Passed.Ayes, 54; Excused, 4--Boone, Gorsek, Piluso, Sprenger; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Heard, Speaker Kotek. |
2017-06-01 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 5, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-31 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 1, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-30 | House | Second reading. |
2017-05-30 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-05-22 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-05-03 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-04-20 | House | Referred to Education. |
2017-04-19 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by President Courtney. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Baertschiger Jr. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-04-14 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Education. |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |