OR SB38 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Effective date, January 1, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Effective date, January 1, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes Oregon Department of Aviation to establish fee to cover tall structure evaluations. Authorizes Oregon Department of Aviation to establish fee to cover tall structure evaluations.
Title
Relating to tall structure evaluation fee.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-06-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and requesting referral to Ways and Means (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and requesting referral to Ways and Means (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-20 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2022. |
2021-08-20 | Senate | Chapter 566, 2021 Laws. |
2021-07-19 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-06-25 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-25 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-22 | House | Third reading. Carried by Gomberg. Passed. Ayes, 54; Nays, 3--Cate, Moore-Green, Zika; Excused, 1--Smith G; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Drazan. |
2021-06-21 | House | Second reading. |
2021-06-18 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-06-16 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-06-16 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Beyer. Passed. Ayes, 23; Nays, 6--Boquist, Heard, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 1--Manning Jr. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-06-11 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Transportation and Economic Development. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Recommendation: Do Pass and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Transportation. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |