OR SB378 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-04 - Chapter 487, 2017 Laws.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-04 - Chapter 487, 2017 Laws.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Adds Oregon Volunteer Firefighters Association to list of entities eligible for individual income tax return checkoff contribution. Provides conditions for use of contributions. Applies to individual income tax returns for tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2017. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to charitable checkoffs; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-04 | Senate | Chapter 487, 2017 Laws. |
2017-07-04 | Senate | Effective date, October 6, 2017. |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2017-06-20 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-06-19 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Boquist. |
2017-06-13 | House | Third reading as Special Order of Business. Carried by Boone. Passed.Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Bentz, McLane. |
2017-06-12 | House | Second reading. |
2017-06-08 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2017-06-06 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-05-01 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2017-04-26 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Thomsen declared potential conflict of interest. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Hansell. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Baertschiger Jr. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue. |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |