OR SB34 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Effective date, January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Effective date, January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Expands "move over law" to include any motor vehicle that is displaying warning or hazard lights or specific indications of distress. Provides that person may comply with law by slowing down or changing lanes.
Title
Relating to the offense of failure to maintain a safe distance from a motor vehicle.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-22 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2018. |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Chapter 305, 2017 Laws. |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2017-06-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 19; nays, 11--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Ferrioli, Girod, Hansell, Knopp, Kruse, Linthicum, Olsen, Thatcher, Winters. |
2017-06-01 | House | Third reading. Carried by Olson. Passed.Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Boone, Lininger, Piluso. |
2017-05-31 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 1, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-30 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 31, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-26 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 30, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-25 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 26, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-24 | House | Second reading. |
2017-05-23 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2017-05-18 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-04-27 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-02 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2017-02-27 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed.Ayes, 16; nays, 13--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Ferrioli, Girod, Hansell, Johnson, Knopp, Kruse, Linthicum, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen, Winters; excused, 1--Dembrow. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Carried over to 02-23 by unanimous consent. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |