OR SB329 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Effective date, May 19, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Effective date, May 19, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allows homeowners and condominium associations to hold electronic meetings. Allows homeowners and condominium associations to hold electronic meetings. Makes changes to delivery of electronic notices. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to communities governed by declarations; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Elizabeth Johnson [D] | Sen. Katherine Lieber [D] | Rep. Maxine Dexter [D] | Rep. Courtney Neron [D] |
Sen. Janeen Sollman [D] | Sen. Suzanne Weber [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-10 | Senate | Effective date, May 19, 2021. |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Chapter 40, 2021 Laws. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-05-13 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-05-12 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-05-11 | House | Third reading. Carried by Neron. Passed. Ayes, 52; Excused, 7--Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Grayber, Levy, Lively, Nearman, Owens; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Morgan. |
2021-05-10 | House | Second reading. |
2021-05-06 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-05-06 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-04-29 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-07 | House | Referred to Housing. |
2021-04-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Johnson. Passed. Ayes, 23; Absent, 4--Heard, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher; Excused, 3--Boquist, Gorsek, Thomsen. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Housing and Development. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |