OR SB329 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Allows homeowners and condominium associations to hold electronic meetings. Allows homeowners and condominium associations to hold electronic meetings. Makes changes to delivery of electronic notices. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to communities governed by declarations; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-06 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-10HouseSecond reading.
2021-05-06HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2021-05-06HouseWork Session held.
2021-04-29HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-04-07HouseReferred to Housing.
2021-04-01HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2021-03-24SenateThird reading. Carried by Johnson. Passed. Ayes, 23; Absent, 4--Heard, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher; Excused, 3--Boquist, Gorsek, Thomsen.
2021-03-18SenateSecond reading.
2021-03-18SenateRecommendation: Do pass.
2021-03-11SenateWork Session held.
2021-02-04SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-19SenateReferred to Housing and Development.
2021-01-11SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback