OR SB318 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Effective date, January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Effective date, January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Permits court to order equal parenting time when developing detailed parenting plan. Creates rebuttable presumption that equal parenting time is in best interests of child. Requires rebuttal of presumption by clear and convincing evidence.] Permits court to deny request for equal parenting time in parenting plan if court determines, by written findings, that equal parenting time is not in best interests of child or endangers safety of parties.
Title
Relating to parenting time in family law proceedings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-17 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2020. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Chapter 288, 2019 Laws. |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-06-03 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-05-30 | House | Third reading. Carried by Sprenger. Passed. Ayes, 52; Nays, 5--Greenlick, Hernandez, Salinas, Sanchez, Smith G; Excused, 1--Williams; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Boles, Williamson. |
2019-05-29 | House | Carried over to May 30, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-28 | House | Carried over to May 29, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-27 | House | Carried over to May 28, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-23 | House | Carried over to May 27, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-22 | House | Second reading. |
2019-05-22 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-05-14 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-05-09 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-05-01 | House | Public Hearing cancelled. |
2019-04-26 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-04-24 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Thatcher. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Winters. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |