OR SB261 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Effective date, June 14, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Effective date, June 14, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Makes evidence about sexual behavior or predisposition inadmissible in civil proceeding except under certain circumstances. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to evidence; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Sara Gelser Blouin [D] | Sen. Michael Dembrow [D] | Sen. Tim Knopp [R] | Sen. James Manning [D] |
Sen. Laurie Monnes Anderson [D] | Rep. Ann Lininger [D] | Rep. Jennifer Williamson [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-22 | Senate | Effective date, June 14, 2017. |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Chapter 321, 2017 Laws. |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2017-06-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-06-01 | House | Third reading. Carried by Williamson. Passed.Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Boone, Piluso. |
2017-05-31 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 1, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-30 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 31, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-26 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 30, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-25 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 26, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-24 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 25, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-23 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 24, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-22 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 23, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-18 | House | Second reading. |
2017-05-17 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-05-15 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-05-01 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2017-05-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed.Ayes, 27; excused, 3--Baertschiger Jr, Monroe, Prozanski. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |