OR SB254 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Removes ability of parent to decline required immunizations against restrictable diseases on behalf of child for reason other than child's indicated medical diagnosis. Removes ability of parent to decline required immunizations against restrictable diseases on behalf of child for reason other than child's indicated medical diagnosis. Allows child who is not immunized or exempt for reason of indicated medical diagnosis to attend school that provides education program through online courses. Prohibits child from attending in person specified school-related events, meetings and opportunities. Allows Oregon Health Authority to recommend diseases in addition to restrictable diseases against which children may be immunized. Directs boards that regulate certain licensed health care practitioners to review documents completed by licensed health care practitioners granting exemptions from immunization requirements because of indicated medical diagnosis. Defines "licensed health care practitioner." Requires boards to annually report to authority on results of review. Requires authority to report annually to Legislative Assembly on reports submitted to boards. Directs authority to establish outreach and education plan regarding disease control in schools. Allows child who is not immunized to continue attending school in person until August 1, 2022. Allows child who is not immunized and has schedule for immunizations approved by authority to continue attending school in person after August 1, 2022. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to health care; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/SB254 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB254/Introduced |