OR SB25 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Effective date, June 11, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Effective date, June 11, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs public bodies, and private medical providers in possession of relevant records, to comply, within specified time period, with court order for release of records to state mental hospital or other facility for purposes of forensic evaluation. Directs public bodies, and private entities] medical providers in possession of relevant records, to comply, within specified time period, with court order for release of records to state mental hospital or other facility for purposes of forensic evaluation. Authorizes exception for good cause and for certain entities. Requires] Allows report resulting from forensic evaluation on issue of mental defense to be filed with court electronically. Specifies manner in which report may be disclosed and used. Allows forensic evaluation on issue of fitness to proceed to be filed with court electronically. Specifies manner in which fitness to proceed evaluations and reports may be disclosed and used. Extends time period of commitment for mental defense examination from 30 days to 60 days.] Requires that court provide, by end of next business] judicial day, copies of orders relating to fitness to proceed to state mental hospital or other facility and community mental health program director or designee, and, if defendant is found to lack fitness, to any entity ordered to provide services and supervision to restore fitness. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to forensic evaluations; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-06-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-17 | Senate | Effective date, June 11, 2019. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Chapter 311, 2019 Laws. |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-06-05 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-06-03 | House | Third reading. Carried by Greenlick. Passed. Ayes, 55; Nays, 1--Leif; Excused, 3--Barker, Boles, Clem; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek. |
2019-05-30 | House | Second reading. |
2019-05-29 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-05-22 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-05-13 | House | Public Hearing cancelled. |
2019-03-28 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-03-27 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Vote explanation filed by Boquist. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Fagan. Passed. Ayes, 24; Nays, 6--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Girod, Heard, Olsen, Thomsen. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |