OR SB21 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs State Fish and Wildlife Commission to develop and adopt by rule invasive grass pilot program in Phillip W. Schneider Wildlife Area. Directs State Fish and Wildlife Commission to develop and adopt by rule invasive grass pilot program in Phillip W. Schneider Wildlife Area. Sunsets pilot program on January 2, 2025.
Title
Relating to invasive grasses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and requesting referral to Ways and Means (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Recommendation: Do Pass and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources and Wildfire Recovery. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |