OR SB2 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-5)
Status: Passed on July 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-03 - Effective date, January 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-5)
Status: Passed on July 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-03 - Effective date, January 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes Scholars for a Healthy Oregon Initiative to provide free tuition and fees for certain students in health care disciplines in exchange for student commitment to work in underrepresented locations after graduation.
Title
Relating to Oregon Health and Science University health care scholarships; and appropriating money.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-03 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2014. |
2013-07-03 | Senate | Chapter 511, 2013 Laws. |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2013-06-24 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-06-24 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-06-21 | House | Third reading. Carried by Sprenger. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Hanna. |
2013-06-20 | House | Second reading. |
2013-06-20 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2013-06-19 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2013-06-19 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Hansell. Passed. Ayes, 29; nays, 1--Bates. |
2013-06-17 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-06-14 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Education. |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Health Care and Human Services, then Ways and Means. |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |