OR SB190 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Department of Consumer and Business Services to study factors contributing to cost of health insurance premiums. Requires Department of Consumer and Business Services to study factors contributing to cost of health insurance premiums. Directs department to submit findings to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to health not later than September 15, 2024. Sunsets January 2, 2025.
Title
Relating to health insurance.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |