OR SB182 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Effective date, January 1, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Effective date, January 1, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Terminates authority of spouse as agent under certain estate planning documents upon annulment, separation or dissolution of marriage. Terminates authority of spouse as agent under certain estate planning documents upon annulment, separation or dissolution of marriage. Extends liability protections for property held as tenants by the entirety when property is conveyed to certain trust. Changes references to "small estate affidavit" to "simple estate affidavit." Permits use of simple estate affidavit if decedent died testate and sole devisee is decedent's trust.] Modifies procedure for disposition of wills by attorney.
Title
Relating to estate planning.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-06-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-30 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2022. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Chapter 272, 2021 Laws. |
2021-06-11 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-06-04 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-01 | House | Third reading. Carried by Wilde. Passed. Ayes, 55; Excused, 2--Clem, Evans; Excused for Business of the House, 3--Holvey, Rayfield, Speaker Kotek. |
2021-05-28 | House | Carried over to June 1, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-05-27 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 28, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-05-26 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 27, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-05-25 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 26, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-05-24 | House | Second reading. |
2021-05-21 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-05-18 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-05-03 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2021-05-03 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-04-28 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-23 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Civil Law. |
2021-03-22 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2021-03-15 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed. Ayes, 26; Nays, 1--Robinson; Excused, 3--Boquist, Heard, Johnson. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |