OR SB177 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Sets forth policy objectives for State Department of Energy in administration of income tax credit allowed for construction or installation of alternative energy devices. Requires department to report biennially to committee of Legislative Assembly on use of credit. Extends sunset for tax credit.
Title
Relating to residential energy.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-04-17 - Senate - Senate Committee Without recommendation as to passage, but with amendments and referred to Tax Credits by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Tax Credits by prior reference. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Recommendation: Without recommendation as to passage but w/amendments and be referred to Tax Credits by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Business and Transportation, then Tax Credits. |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |