OR SB1701 | 2020 | 2nd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on October 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-06 - Effective date, September 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on October 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-06 - Effective date, September 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that unemployed individual receiving unemployment insurance benefits for weeks ending before January 1, 2022, who has earnings from less than full-time employment may earn greater of $300 or one-third of individual's weekly benefit amount before individual's weekly benefit amount is reduced. Provides that unemployed individual receiving unemployment insurance benefits for weeks ending before January 1, 2022, who has earnings from less than full-time employment may earn greater of $300 or one-third of individual's weekly benefit amount before individual's weekly benefit amount is reduced. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to unemployment insurance benefits; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-08-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-08-10 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-08-10 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-06 | Senate | Effective date, September 1, 2020. |
2020-10-06 | Senate | Chapter 1, 2020 Laws. |
2020-09-01 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2020-08-20 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-08-13 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-08-10 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Holvey. Passed. Ayes, 52; Nays, 5--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Nearman, Reschke; Excused, 3--Barreto, Mitchell, Power. |
2020-08-10 | House | Rules suspended. Second reading. |
2020-08-10 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2020-08-10 | House | Referred to The Second Special Session of 2020. |
2020-08-10 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2020-08-10 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Monnes Anderson. Passed. Ayes, 21; Nays, 6--Baertschiger Jr, Findley, Girod, Heard, Linthicum, Thomsen; Excused, 3--Boquist, Hansell, Olsen. |
2020-08-10 | Senate | Rules suspended. Second reading. |
2020-08-10 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)(Amendments distributed) |
2020-08-10 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2020-08-10 | Senate | Referred to The Second Special Session of 2020. |
2020-08-10 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |