OR SB1605 | 2020 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on July 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-07 - Governor signed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies Oregon Promise program to extend eligibility to certain Oregon foster children who attain their highest level of education while in out-of-state placements. Temporarily permits Department of Human Services to close at screening reports of third party child abuse not involving child's parent or caregiver, member of child's household, person responsible for child's care, provider of child care or school employee, contractor, agent or volunteer. Directs department to report to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to child welfare regarding reports closed at screening and to identify resources required to investigate all allegations of third party abuse. Sunsets March 31, 2021. Directs Department of Human Services to adopt rules allowing up to two family-based group homes to provide services to certain children. Directs department to report to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to child welfare regarding success of placements in family-based group homes. Sunsets January 2, 2024. Prohibits placement of Oregon children in out-of-state child-caring agency unless child-caring agency is licensed by Department of Human Services. Establishes certain contract requirements and department duties regarding placements of children in out-of-state child-caring agencies. Delays operation of laws regarding placement of children in qualified residential treatment programs to December 1, 2020. Requires qualified residential treatment programs and psychiatric residential treatment programs to maintain site-specific accreditation from nationally recognized organization. Prohibits colocation of children and youth committed to custody of Oregon Youth Authority without court order. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to children; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-07SenateGovernor signed.
2020-07-07HouseSpeaker signed.
2020-06-30SenatePresident signed.
2020-06-26HouseRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Keny-Guyer. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Barker, Barreto, Clem.
2020-06-26HouseRules suspended. Second reading.
2020-06-26HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2020-06-26HouseReferred to The First Special Session of 2020.
2020-06-26HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2020-06-26SenateRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed. Ayes, 26; Excused, 4--Boles, Hansell, Linthicum, Olsen.
2020-06-26SenateRules suspended. Second reading.
2020-06-26SenateRecommendation: Do pass.
2020-06-25SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2020-06-24SenateReferred to The First Special Session of 2020.
2020-06-24SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback