OR SB1602 | 2020 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-5)
Status: Passed on July 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-07 - Governor signed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires Governor to facilitate mediation sessions between forest industry and environmental interest representatives. Identifies purposes and completion goal for, and provides for confidentiality of, mediation sessions. Requires joint legislative committee hearing during 2021 regular session regarding mediation process. Allows person to register with State Forestry Department to receive notice of pesticide applications by helicopter to forestland near person's residence or water intake used by person. Requires notice to department of proposed or imminent pesticide application by helicopter to forestland. Requires department to give notice of application to persons registered to receive notice. Requires notice to department upon completion or partial completion of pesticide application. Provides escalating penalties for failures to report. Caps penalties at $5,000 per day. Requires Pesticide Analytical and Response Center to accept requests from certain entities for records and data concerning pesticide application by helicopter to forestland. Imposes fine of $1,000 for pesticide operator failure to timely supply records or data. Prohibits interfering with pesticide application by helicopter to forestland. Makes violation subject to fine of $1,000 for first offense, or $5,000 for repeat offense, within five years. Prohibits pesticide application by helicopter to forestland in proximity to certain locations. Requires that certain rules apply in Siskiyou Georegion. Requires that inventoried points of diversion for water use qualifying for spray buffer be entered in department reporting system. Requires report to Legislative Assembly regarding inventory progress. Appropriates moneys to Office of Governor for biennium ending June 30, 2021, for paying expenses related to mediation sessions.] Appropriates moneys to State Forestry Department for biennium ending June 30, 2021, for department duties, functions and powers under Act with regard to private forests.] Increases limitation on expenditures for biennium ending June 30, 2021, by State Forestry Department for carrying out department duties, functions and powers under Act with regard to private forests.] Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to forests; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-07SenateGovernor signed.
2020-07-07HouseSpeaker signed.
2020-06-30SenatePresident signed.
2020-06-26HouseVote explanation(s) filed by Mitchell.
2020-06-26HouseRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Holvey, Witt. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Barker, Barreto, Clem.
2020-06-26HouseRules suspended. Second reading.
2020-06-26HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2020-06-26HouseReferred to The First Special Session of 2020.
2020-06-26HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2020-06-26SenateRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Girod. Passed. Ayes, 24; Nays, 2--Baertschiger Jr, Thomsen; Excused, 4--Boles, Hansell, Linthicum, Olsen.
2020-06-24SenateRules suspended. Second reading.
2020-06-24SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
2020-06-24SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2020-06-24SenateReferred to The First Special Session of 2020.
2020-06-24SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback