OR SB1590 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Department of Education, in consultation with STEM Investment Council, to develop statewide, long-term strategic plan to provide computer science education. Directs Department of Education, in consultation with STEM Investment Council, to develop statewide, long-term strategic plan to provide computer science education. Requires department to coordinate with council to submit annual report to interim committee of Legislative Assembly related to education. Sunsets January 2, 2028. Establishes computer science as subject for which department must provide academic content standards. Encourages school districts and public charter schools to offer students courses or other instructional opportunities in computer science. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to computer science education; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Janeen Sollman [D] | Sen. Kayse Jama [D] | Sen. Rob Wagner [D] | Sen. Lew Frederick [D] |
Sen. Chris Gorsek [D] | Sen. Bill Hansell [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Education. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |