OR SB1531 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-4)
Status: Passed on March 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-20 - Effective date, March 19, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Specifies that governing body of city or county may adopt ordinances that impose reasonable regulations on operation of medical marijuana facilities. Specifies that governing body of city or county may prohibit the establishment or regulate or restrict the operationÙ adopt ordinances that impose reasonable regulations on operation of medical marijuana facilities. Specifies that governing body of city or county may enact moratorium on operation of registered medical marijuana facility until May 1, 2015, if moratorium is enacted no later than May 1, 2014. Imposes standards for transference of tetrahydrocannabinol-infused products by medical marijuana facilities. Declares emergency, effective March 1, 2014.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to marijuana facilities; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - House (Y: 51 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - House - House Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-20SenateEffective date, March 19, 2014.
2014-03-20SenateChapter 79, 2014 Laws.
2014-03-19SenateGovernor signed.
2014-03-11HouseSpeaker signed.
2014-03-11SenatePresident signed.
2014-03-07SenateVote explanation(s) filed by Hansell.
2014-03-07SenateSenate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 28; nays, 2--Dembrow, Shields.
2014-03-05HouseVote explanation(s) filed by Buckley, Holvey, Keny-Guyer.
2014-03-05HouseRead. Carried by Clem. Passed.Ayes, 51; Nays, 6--Bentz, Greenlick, Hanna, Holvey, Smith, Thompson; Excused, 3--Berger, Conger, Weidner.
2014-03-05HouseIn absence of motion to substitute Minority Report for Committee Report, bill advanced to third reading by order of Presiding Officer.
2014-03-05HouseMinority Recommendation: Do pass.
2014-03-05HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed C-Engrossed.
2014-03-04HouseWork Session held.
2014-03-04HouseMotion to refer to Rules carried. Referred.Ayes, 30; Nays, 28--Barker, Bentz, Cameron, Conger, Davis, Esquivel, Freeman, Gilliam, Gorsek, Hanna, Hicks, Huffman, Jenson, Johnson, Kennemer, Krieger, Matthews, McLane, Olson, Parrish, Richardson, Smith, Sprenger, Thatcher, Thompson, Whisnant, Whitsett, Witt; Excused, 2--Berger, Weidner.
2014-03-04HouseRead. Carried by Olson.
2014-03-03HouseMotion to make Special Order of Business on Tuesday, March 4, 2014 adopted.Ayes, 31; Nays, 27--Barker, Bentz, Cameron, Conger, Davis, Esquivel, Freeman, Gilliam, Gorsek, Hanna, Hicks, Huffman, Jenson, Johnson, Kennemer, Krieger, Matthews, McLane, Olson, Parrish, Richardson, Smith, Sprenger, Thatcher, Thompson, Whisnant, Whitsett; Excused, 2--Berger, Weidner.
2014-03-03HouseThird reading. Carried by Olson.
2014-02-28HouseRules suspended. Carried over to March 3, 2014 Calendar.
2014-02-27HouseSecond reading.
2014-02-26HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
2014-02-24HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2014-02-19HouseReferred to Judiciary.
2014-02-19HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2014-02-18SenateThird reading. Carried by Hansell, Monroe. Passed.Ayes, 30.
2014-02-17SenateSecond reading.
2014-02-14SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
2014-02-13SenateWork Session held.
2014-02-11SenatePublic Hearing held.
2014-02-03SenateReferred to Judiciary.
2014-02-03SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Measures/Overview/SB1531
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1531/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1531/Senate%20Amendments
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1531/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1531/House%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1531/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1531/House%20Amendments%20to%20B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1531/C-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1531/House%20Minority%20Report%20B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1531/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/20066
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=317064
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/20188
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/20275
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=318887
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=318956
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=319203

Bill Comments

feedback