OR SB1526 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Effective date, April 3, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Effective date, April 3, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits court from considering parent's disability in determining whether to terminate parental rights unless parent's conduct related to disability is of such nature and duration as to render parent incapable of providing proper care to child or ward for extended periods of time. Prohibits court from considering parent's disability in determining whether to terminate parental rights absent finding that behaviors or limitations related to parent's disability will endanger health, safety or welfare of child or ward even when accommodations or support services are in place] unless parent's conduct related to disability is of such nature and duration as to render parent incapable of providing proper care to child or ward for extended periods of time. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to the parental rights of individuals with disabilities; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2018-02-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-11 | Senate | Effective date, April 3, 2018. |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Chapter 74, 2018 Laws. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2018-03-02 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-02-27 | House | Third reading. Carried by Piluso. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Evans, Gorsek, Olson. |
2018-02-26 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to February 27, 2018 Calendar. |
2018-02-23 | House | Second reading. |
2018-02-23 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2018-02-22 | House | Work Session held. |
2018-02-20 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2018-02-15 | House | Referred to Human Services and Housing. |
2018-02-12 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Knopp. Passed. Ayes, 25; Excused, 5--Kruse, Riley, Thatcher, Thomsen, Winters. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Second reading. |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Human Services. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Presession Released to the Public. |