OR SB1526 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-10 - Effective date, March 3, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-10 - Effective date, March 3, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Oregon Health Authority to investigate whether, and under what terms and conditions, Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services is likely to approve using Children's Health Insurance Program funds to subsidize costs of commercial health insurance coverage for children with family incomes from 200 percent to 300 percent of federal poverty guidelines. Requires Oregon Health Authority to request federal approval to use investigate whether, and under what terms and conditions, Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services is likely to approve using Children's Health Insurance Program funds to subsidize costs of commercial health insurance coverage for children with family incomes from 200 percent to 300 percent of federal poverty guidelines. Requires authority to notify interim committee of status of request and to notify Legislative Counsel if request is approved or denied. Requires authority to report findings to Senate Interim Committee on Health Care and Human Services no later than September 15, 2014. Repeals Act on September 1, 2015, if federal approval is denied or not approved by adjournment sine die of 2015 legislative session date of convening of 2015 regular session of Legislative Assembly. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to children's health care coverage; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Elizabeth Steiner Hayward [D] | Sen. Alan Bates [D] | Sen. Elizabeth Johnson [D] | Sen. Laurie Monnes Anderson [D] |
Rep. David Gomberg [D] | Rep. Mitch Greenlick [D] | Rep. Nancy Nathanson [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-10 | Senate | Effective date, March 3, 2014. |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Chapter 17, 2014 Laws. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2014-02-24 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-02-21 | House | Third reading. Carried by Kennemer. Passed.Ayes, 56; Absent, 1--Gilliam; Excused, 2--Davis, Esquivel; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Thompson. |
2014-02-20 | House | Second reading. |
2014-02-20 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2014-02-19 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2014-02-14 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2014-02-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Steiner Hayward. Passed.Ayes, 30. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Second reading. |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Health Care and Human Services. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |