OR SB150 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-23 - Effective date, January 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-23 - Effective date, January 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Increases maximum civil penalty for violations of election law or rule.
Title
Relating to conduct of elections.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-23 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2014. |
2013-07-23 | Senate | Chapter 617, 2013 Laws. |
2013-07-03 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2013-07-02 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-07-01 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-06-28 | House | Third reading. Carried by Garrett. Passed. Ayes, 37; Nays, 23--Bentz, Cameron, Conger, Esquivel, Freeman, Gilliam, Hanna, Hicks, Huffman, Jenson, Johnson, Kennemer, Krieger, McLane, Parrish, Richardson, Smith, Sprenger, Thatcher, Thompson, Weidner, Whisnant, Whitsett. |
2013-06-27 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2013-06-27 | House | Second reading. |
2013-06-26 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-06-24 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-06-19 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2013-06-19 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Rosenbaum. Passed. Ayes, 21; nays, 9--Baertschiger, Boquist, Close, George, Girod, Kruse, Starr, Thomsen, Whitsett. |
2013-06-17 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-06-14 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |