OR SB148 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President.
Pending: Joint Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Extends sunset for tax credit for individual development account donations. Extends sunset for tax credit for individual development account donations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a tax credit for individual development account donations.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and refer to Tax Expenditures by prior reference (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-30SenateReferred to Ways and Means by order of the President.
2021-03-30SenateRecommendation: Do Pass and subsequent referral to Tax Expenditures be rescinded and refer to Ways and Means by order of the President.
2021-03-18SenateWork Session held.
2021-02-04SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-19SenateReferred to Housing and Development, then Tax Expenditures.
2021-01-11SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback