OR SB141 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-16 - Chapter 476, 2021 Laws.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-16 - Chapter 476, 2021 Laws.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Makes percentage of partial property tax exemption for property of vertical housing development projects proportional to allocation of floor area to residential housing or low income residential housing, without rounding up or down. Makes percentage of partial property tax exemption for property of vertical housing development projects proportional to allocation of equalized floors] floor area to residential housing or low income residential housing, without rounding up or down. Clarifies terminology used for computations of partial property tax exemption. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to vertical housing development projects; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-06-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - House Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill and be referred to Revenue by prior reference (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - House Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill and be referred to Revenue by prior reference (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-16 | Senate | Chapter 476, 2021 Laws. |
2021-08-16 | Senate | Effective date, September 25, 2021. |
2021-07-14 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-06-22 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-22 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-15 | House | Third reading. Carried by Meek. Passed. Ayes, 54; Excused, 1--Noble; Excused for Business of the House, 4--Owens, Rayfield, Smith G, Speaker Kotek. |
2021-06-14 | House | Second reading. |
2021-06-14 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-06-09 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-06-07 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-05-12 | House | Referred to Revenue by prior reference. |
2021-05-12 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Revenue by prior reference. |
2021-05-11 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-04-29 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-08 | House | Referred to Housing with subsequent referral to Revenue. |
2021-04-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Boquist. Passed. Ayes, 26; Nays, 4--Girod, Heard, Linthicum, Thatcher. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |