OR SB141 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Oregon Health Authority to issue grants to Oregon hospitals to establish and maintain, or contract with third party to provide, process for providing caring contacts to hospital patients who present in emergency department with suicidal ideation or attempted suicide. Requires Oregon Health Authority to establish or contract for establishment of statewide mental health crisis support access line to facilitate specified services for individuals experiencing behavioral health crises.] issue grants to Oregon hospitals to establish and maintain, or contract with third party to provide, process for providing caring contacts to hospital patients who present in emergency department with suicidal ideation or attempted suicide. Requires authority to study existing barriers within communities of this state that limit availability of appropriate follow-up care for patients discharged from hospitals following treatment for behavioral health crises and to report to Legislative Assembly by October 15, 2020. Sunsets June 30, 2021. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to individuals experiencing behavioral health crises; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |