OR SB134 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-16 - Chapter 475, 2021 Laws.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-16 - Chapter 475, 2021 Laws.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Creates exemption to disclosure of information or records regarding certain youth participating in Oregon Youth Authority programs or treatment. Creates exemption to disclosure of information or records regarding certain youth participating in Oregon Youth Authority programs or treatment.
Title
Relating to limits on disclosure of youth records.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-16 | Senate | Chapter 475, 2021 Laws. |
2021-08-16 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2022. |
2021-07-14 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-06-21 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-09 | House | Third reading. Carried by Morgan. Passed. Ayes, 56; Excused, 2--Nearman, Williams; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Fahey, Speaker Kotek. |
2021-06-08 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 9, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-06-07 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 8, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-06-03 | House | Second reading. |
2021-06-03 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-05-25 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-05-24 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-05-11 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2021-05-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed. Ayes, 23; Nays, 4--Findley, Girod, Linthicum, Thomsen; Excused, 3--Heard, Johnson, President Courtney. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |