OR SB130 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-25 - Effective date, January 1, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-25 - Effective date, January 1, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Delays sunset for pilot program allowing participating irrigation districts to change place of use for water within district boundaries without applying for temporary transfer. Delays sunset for pilot program allowing participating irrigation districts to change place of use for water within district boundaries without applying for temporary transfer.
Title
Relating to delaying the sunsetting of a pilot project regarding temporary transfers of place of use within an irrigation district.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-05-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-25 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2022. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Chapter 32, 2021 Laws. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-05-11 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-05-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-05-06 | House | Third reading. Carried by Breese-Iverson. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Alonso Leon, Nearman, Salinas. |
2021-05-05 | House | Second reading. |
2021-05-04 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-05-04 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-04-29 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-03-22 | House | Referred to Water. |
2021-03-15 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Golden. Passed. Ayes, 29; Nays, 1--Heard. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources and Wildfire Recovery. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |