OR SB124 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Effective date, September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Effective date, September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds certified speech-language pathology assistant to membership of State Board of Examiners for Speech-Language Pathology and Audiology. Adds certified speech-language pathology assistant to membership of State Board of Examiners for Speech-Language Pathology and Audiology. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to membership of the State Board of Examiners for Speech-Language Pathology and Audiology; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-05-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | Senate | Effective date, September 25, 2021. |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Chapter 138, 2021 Laws. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-05-26 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-05-20 | House | Third reading. Carried by Alonso Leon. Passed. Ayes, 52; Excused, 7--Breese-Iverson, Bynum, Holvey, Noble, Power, Sanchez, Stark; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Boshart Davis. |
2021-05-19 | House | Carried over to May 20, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-05-18 | House | Second reading. |
2021-05-17 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-05-13 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-04-29 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-07 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2021-04-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Beyer. Passed. Ayes, 29; Nays, 1--Heard. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |