OR SB1059 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires State Department of Agriculture to study department's policies concerning organic agriculture. Requires State Department of Agriculture to study department's policies concerning organic agriculture. Directs department to submit findings to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to agriculture no later than September 15, 2024.
Title
Relating to State Department of Agriculture policies concerning organic agriculture.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources. |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |