OR SB1024 | 2010 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-04 - Effective date, March 4, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-04 - Effective date, March 4, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to highway access; and declaring an emergency.
Title
Relating to highway access; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-04 | Effective date, March 4, 2010. | |
2010-03-04 | Chapter 31, 2010 Laws. | |
2010-03-04 | Governor signed. | |
2010-02-24 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-02-24 | President signed. | |
2010-02-22 | Third reading. Carried by Gilman. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 1--Schaufler; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Nolan. | |
2010-02-19 | Rules suspended. Carried over to February 22, 2010 Calendar. | |
2010-02-18 | Second reading. | |
2010-02-17 | Recommendation: Do pass. | |
2010-02-17 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2010-02-16 | Referred to Transportation. | |
2010-02-16 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. | |
2010-02-15 | Third reading. Carried by Johnson. Passed. Ayes, 30. | |
2010-02-12 | Second reading. | |
2010-02-11 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) | |
2010-02-08 | Work Session held. | |
2010-02-03 | Public Hearing held. | |
2010-02-01 | Referred to Business and Transportation. | |
2010-02-01 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |