OR SB1019 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-14 - Effective date, January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Amends standards regulating egg production and sale of eggs and egg products. Exempts owners and operators of commercial farm having annual egg production from flock of 3,000 or fewer egg-laying hens. Exempts eggs produced at commercial farm by flock of 3,000 or fewer egg-laying hens. Amends definitions. Prohibits transactions involving eggs or egg products not produced in accordance with standards. Creates exceptions to egg-laying hen confinement prohibition. Makes imposition of civil penalty for egg law violations mandatory. Requires inspection of farms engaged in commercial production of eggs. Becomes operative January 1, 2024. Makes amendments to egg-laying hen housing standards operative January 1, 2024. Makes sunset two years earlier for provision establishing percentage goal regarding confinement conditions for egg-laying hens. Makes legislative findings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the egg industry.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-14SenateEffective date, January 1, 2020.
2019-08-14SenateChapter 686, 2019 Laws.
2019-08-09SenateGovernor signed.
2019-07-10HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-07-03SenatePresident signed.
2019-06-30HouseThird reading. Carried by Neron. Passed. Ayes, 39; Nays, 16--Barreto, Bonham, Boshart Davis, Drazan, Evans, Findley, Leif, McKeown, McLane, Nearman, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Stark, Williamson, Wilson; Excused, 4--Clem, Noble, Sprenger, Wallan.
2019-06-29HouseRules suspended. Rules suspended. Carried over to June 30, 2019 Calendar.
2019-06-29HouseRules suspended. Second reading.
2019-06-29HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2019-06-29HouseReferred to Ways and Means.
2019-06-29HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2019-06-29SenateThird reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed. Ayes, 22; Nays, 5--Baertschiger Jr, Heard, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen; Absent, 2--Girod, Linthicum; Excused, 1--Boquist.
2019-06-19SenateSecond reading.
2019-06-18SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
2019-06-14SenateWork Session held.
2019-06-11SenateReturned to Full Committee.
2019-06-11SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2019-06-07SenateAssigned to Subcommittee On Natural Resources.
2019-04-16SenateReferred to Ways and Means by order of the President.
2019-04-16SenateRecommendation: Do Pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
2019-04-08SenateWork Session held.
2019-04-04SenatePublic Hearing held.
2019-03-22SenateReferred to Environment and Natural Resources.
2019-03-21SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/SB1019
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1019/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1019/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1019/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1019/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1019/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1019/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/28865
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/29987
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=477563
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=478263

Bill Comments

feedback