OR HJR32 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes amendment to Oregon Constitution to remove county clerks from elective officials of county.
Title
Proposing amendment to Oregon Constitution relating to county clerks.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-03-18 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-03-04 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2013-02-25 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |