OR HJR14 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes amendment to Oregon Constitution directing Legislative Assembly to adopt sales tax at rate of five percent on sales of tangible personal property and services and use tax at rate of five percent on purchase price of tangible personal property. Requires exemption from taxes for necessities. Requires 75 percent of net annual revenue from tax to be used to fund education through post-secondary level and 25 percent to be used for property tax relief for senior citizens and income tax relief for individuals with income below levels set by law. Preempts local sales and use taxes not approved on or before November 8, 2016. Refers proposed amendment to people for their approval or rejection at next regular general election.
Title
Proposing amendment to Oregon Constitution relating to a sales and use tax.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Holvey [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2015-01-16 | House | Referred to Revenue with subsequent referral to Rules. |
2015-01-12 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2015R1/Measures/Overview/HJR14 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HJR14/Introduced |