OR HJM26 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-21 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-21 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Urging United States Department of Veterans Affairs to ensure community health needs are met through Roseburg VA Medical Center and encouraging establishment of full Level II hospital in Roseburg, Oregon.
Title
Urging United States Department of Veterans Affairs to ensure community health needs are met through Roseburg VA Medical Center and encouraging establishment of full Level II hospital in Roseburg, Oregon.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-21 | Filed with Secretary of State. | |
2011-06-20 | President signed. | |
2011-06-17 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2011-06-13 | Final reading. Carried by Kruse. Adopted. Ayes, 30. | |
2011-06-10 | Second reading. | |
2011-06-10 | Recommendation: Be adopted. | |
2011-06-07 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2011-05-25 | Referred to Rules. | |
2011-05-24 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | |
2011-05-23 | Rules suspended. Read. Carried by Hanna, Freeman. Adopted. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Brewer, Frederick. | |
2011-05-23 | Rules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on May 23, 2011 Calendar. | |
2011-05-20 | Recommendation: Be adopted. | |
2011-05-18 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2011-04-22 | Referred to Rules. | |
2011-04-18 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. |