OR HCR6 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-17 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-17 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
In memoriam: Michael A. Gibbons, 1943-2020. In memoriam: Michael A. Gibbons, 1943-2020.
Title
In memoriam: Michael A. Gibbons, 1943-2020.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do adopt (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - House Read and Adopted (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do adopt (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - House Read and Adopted (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-17 | House | Filed with Secretary of State. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Final reading. Carried by Wagner. Adopted. Ayes, 29; Absent, 1--Heard. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Recommendation: Do adopt. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-04-27 | House | Read. Carried by Gomberg. Adopted. Ayes, 56; Excused, 4--Hudson, Leif, Nearman, Smith G. |
2021-04-26 | House | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2021-04-20 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-02-04 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |