OR HCR35 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-11)
Status: Passed on June 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-03 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Recognizes 2019 as International Year of the Salmon and expresses support for associated global initiative affirming importance of wild salmon.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recognizing 2019 as International Year of the Salmon.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Committee Do adopt (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House Read and Adopted (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-03HouseFiled with Secretary of State.
2019-06-03SenatePresident signed.
2019-05-31HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-05-29SenateFinal reading. Carried by Dembrow. Adopted. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Olsen, Winters.
2019-05-28SenateSecond reading.
2019-05-28SenateRecommendation: Do adopt.
2019-05-21SenateWork Session held.
2019-05-16SenatePublic Hearing held.
2019-05-06SenateReferred to Environment and Natural Resources.
2019-05-02SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2019-04-30HouseRead. Carried by Helm, Smith DB. Adopted. Ayes, 54; Excused, 5--Barker, Boles, Meek, Nearman, Sprenger; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Findley.
2019-04-29HouseRecommendation: Be adopted.
2019-04-24HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2019-04-17HouseReferred to Rules.
2019-04-10HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback