OR HCR31 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 25-12)
Status: Passed on June 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-25 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 25-12)
Status: Passed on June 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-25 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Honors Ashton James Eaton for outstanding achievements.
Title
Honoring Ashton James Eaton for outstanding achievements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-25 | House | Filed with Secretary of State. |
2013-06-25 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-06-24 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-06-21 | Senate | Final reading. Carried by Knopp. Adopted. Ayes, 30. |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2013-06-19 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2013-06-05 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2013-06-04 | House | Read. Carried by Conger. Adopted. Ayes, 58; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Buckley, Speaker Kotek. |
2013-05-28 | House | Rules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on June 4, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-05-20 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 28, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-05-13 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 20, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-05-08 | House | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2013-05-06 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2013-04-08 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2013-04-08 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |