OR HCR23 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates April 13, 2019, as Curtis Tigard Day.
Title
Designating April 13, 2019, as Curtis Tigard Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House Special Order (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House Special Order (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-06 | House | Filed with Secretary of State. |
2019-05-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-05-01 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Final reading. Carried by Burdick. Adopted. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Girod, Winters. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-04-11 | House | Read as Special Order of Business. Carried by Doherty. Adopted. Ayes, 55; Excused, 4--Barreto, Noble, Sprenger, Stark; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Bynum. |
2019-04-03 | House | Rules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on April 11, 2019 Calendar. |
2019-04-02 | House | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2019-04-01 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-02-25 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2019-02-20 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |