OR HB5033 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-01 - Chapter 612, (2019 Laws): Effective date July 23, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-01 - Chapter 612, (2019 Laws): Effective date July 23, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Department of Revenue for biennial expenses. Limits certain biennial expenditures from fees, moneys or other revenues, including Miscellaneous Receipts and federal service agreement reimbursements, but excluding lottery funds and other federal funds, collected or received by department. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2019.
Title
Relating to the financial administration of the Department of Revenue; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-07 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-07 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-01 | House | Chapter 612, (2019 Laws): Effective date July 23, 2019. |
2019-07-23 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-07-02 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-06-30 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | Vote explanation filed by Wagner. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Wagner. Passed. Ayes, 26; Nays, 1--Olsen; Absent, 2--Girod, Linthicum; Excused, 1--Boquist. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-06-18 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-06-17 | House | Third reading. Carried by Smith G. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Nosse, Rayfield. |
2019-06-13 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 17, 2019 Calendar. |
2019-06-12 | House | Second reading. |
2019-06-11 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2019-06-07 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-06-05 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2019-06-05 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-05-07 | House | Public Hearing cancelled. |
2019-05-06 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-27 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-26 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-25 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-21 | House | Public Hearing cancelled. |
2019-03-20 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-19 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-18 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-23 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On General Government. |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |