OR HB5030 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-14 - Chapter 671, (2019 Laws): Effective date August 9, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-14 - Chapter 671, (2019 Laws): Effective date August 9, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Increases amount of lottery bonds authorized to be issued for Oregon Business Development Department and Housing and Community Services Department. Appropriates moneys from General Fund to _____ for biennial expenses.] Limits biennial expenditures from fees, moneys or other revenues, including Miscellaneous Receipts, but excluding lottery funds and federal funds, collected or received by _______.] Limits biennial expenditures of _____ from federal funds.] Authorizes issuance of various other lottery bonds. Establishes funds, or provides for deposit of moneys into existing funds, and appropriates moneys for projects financed. Modifies laws relating to issuance of lottery bonds for Coos Bay Channel Project. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2019.
Title
Relating to lottery bonds; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-14 | House | Chapter 671, (2019 Laws): Effective date August 9, 2019. |
2019-08-09 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-07-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-07-02 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-30 | Senate | Gelser, excused, granted unanimous consent to vote aye. |
2019-06-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Steiner Hayward. Passed. Ayes, 28; Absent, 2--Girod, Linthicum. |
2019-06-30 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-06-30 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-06-26 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Holvey. Passed. Ayes, 51; Nays, 5--Keny-Guyer, McLane, Nearman, Post, Reschke; Excused, 4--Barreto, Clem, Hernandez, Reardon. |
2019-06-26 | House | Potential conflict(s) of interest declared by Smith G. |
2019-06-26 | House | Second reading. |
2019-06-26 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2019-06-25 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-06-25 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2019-06-25 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-06-24 | House | Work Session cancelled. |
2019-04-19 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-23 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction. |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |