OR HB5006 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-19 - Chapter 628, (2013 Laws): Effective date July 19, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-19 - Chapter 628, (2013 Laws): Effective date July 19, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Directs distribution of moneys from Criminal Fine Account.
Title
Relating to the financial administration of the Criminal Fine Account; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-19 | House | Chapter 628, (2013 Laws): Effective date July 19, 2013. |
2013-07-19 | House | Governor signed. |
2013-07-15 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-07-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-07-08 | House | Rules suspended. House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Boone, Keny-Guyer. |
2013-07-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Winters. Passed. Ayes, 27; nays, 2--Ferrioli, George; excused, 1--Starr. |
2013-07-08 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-07-08 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill to resolve conflicts. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2013-07-07 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-07-06 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2013-07-06 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2013-07-06 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Nathanson. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Weidner. |
2013-07-06 | House | Second reading. |
2013-07-06 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2013-07-06 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-07-05 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2013-07-05 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-01-23 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2013-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |