OR HB5002 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-19 - Chapter 627, (2013 Laws): Effective date July 19, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-19 - Chapter 627, (2013 Laws): Effective date July 19, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Oregon Department of Administrative Services for certain biennial expenses.
Title
Relating to the financial administration of the Oregon Department of Administrative Services; appropriating money; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-19 | House | Chapter 627, (2013 Laws): Effective date July 19, 2013. |
2013-07-19 | House | Governor signed. |
2013-07-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-07-01 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Starr, absent, granted unanimous consent to vote nay. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Steiner Hayward. Passed. Ayes, 18; nays, 10--Baertschiger, Boquist, Close, Ferrioli, George, Girod, Kruse, Olsen, Starr, Thomsen; excused, 2--Dingfelder, Edwards. |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2013-06-24 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2013-06-24 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2013-06-21 | House | Third reading. Carried by Smith. Passed. Ayes, 58; Nays, 1--Weidner; Excused, 1--Hanna. |
2013-06-20 | House | Second reading. |
2013-06-20 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2013-06-19 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-06-05 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2013-06-05 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-04-30 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-04-29 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-02-21 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-02-20 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-02-19 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-02-18 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-02-14 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-02-13 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-02-12 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-02-11 | House | Informational Meeting held. |
2013-01-23 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On General Government. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2013-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |