OR HB4205 | 2020 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-3)
Status: Passed on July 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-07 - Chapter 5, (2020 Laws): Effective date June 30, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-3)
Status: Passed on July 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-07 - Chapter 5, (2020 Laws): Effective date June 30, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires police officer or reserve officer to intervene to prevent or stop another officer engaged in certain misconduct, unless intervening officer cannot intervene safely. Directs Department of Public Safety Standards and Training to adopt rules requiring police officer to intervene to stop another police officer from engaging in act that is unethical or that violates law, rules or policy. Directs department to adopt rules requiring police officer to report to appropriate authority when any police officer engages in act that is unethical or that violates law, rules or policy.] Requires police officer or reserve officer to intervene to prevent or stop another officer engaged in certain misconduct, unless intervening officer cannot intervene safely. Requires police officer or reserve officer who witnesses another officer engaged in certain misconduct to report misconduct to supervisor within 72 hours after witnessing misconduct. Prohibits discrimination or retaliation against officer who intervenes or reports as required. Directs Department of Public Safety Standards and Training to report annually to appropriate committee of Legislative Assembly on rules adopted by department to implement requirements. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to duties of police officers regarding prohibited behavior; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-07 | House | Chapter 5, (2020 Laws): Effective date June 30, 2020. |
2020-06-30 | House | Governor signed. |
2020-06-30 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-06-29 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Vote explanations filed by Boquist, Prozanski, Taylor, Thatcher. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed. Ayes, 26; Excused, 4--Hansell, Johnson, Linthicum, Olsen. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Rules Suspended. Second reading. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Referred to The First Special Session of 2020. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2020-06-26 | House | Vote explanation(s) filed by Leif, Smith DB, Wallan, Williams. |
2020-06-26 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Alonso Leon. Passed. Ayes, 55; Nays, 2--Nearman, Reschke; Excused, 3--Barker, Barreto, Clem. |
2020-06-26 | House | Second reading. |
2020-06-26 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2020-06-25 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2020-06-24 | House | Referred to The First Special Session of 2020. |
2020-06-24 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |